Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/24/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/02/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/02/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/02/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/02/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/02/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/02/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/31/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/31/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/23/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/01/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/01/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/06/2012