Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/14/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/14/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 09/14/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/14/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/14/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/14/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/15/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/21/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/23/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/23/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/05/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/31/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/19/2012