Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/21/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/16/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 11/18/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/29/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/07/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/12/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/21/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/21/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/26/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/17/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/24/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/15/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 08/01/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/12/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/19/2012