Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/05/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 08/05/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 08/05/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/27/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/27/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/20/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/20/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/20/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/20/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/20/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/21/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/26/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/11/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/25/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/25/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/31/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/01/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/01/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/02/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 08/02/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/07/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/10/2012