Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 08/09/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/01/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/31/2012