Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 11/30/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/07/2012