Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/26/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/27/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/27/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/27/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/27/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/27/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/27/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/27/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/27/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/27/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/27/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/28/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/28/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 07/28/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/28/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/28/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/28/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/29/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/29/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/29/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/29/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/29/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/29/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/29/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/29/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/29/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/29/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/29/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 08/01/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 08/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/01/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 08/01/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 08/05/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/05/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/05/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/05/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/05/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/05/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 08/05/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/05/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 08/05/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/05/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/05/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/05/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 08/05/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/05/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 08/05/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/05/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/05/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/05/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 08/05/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 08/05/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/05/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 08/05/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/05/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 08/05/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 08/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 08/05/2011