Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/25/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/07/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/16/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/18/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/05/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/19/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/17/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/17/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/23/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/25/2012