Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/04/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/31/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/31/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/02/2011