Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/20/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/20/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/20/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/20/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/25/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 07/27/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/27/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/27/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/27/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/27/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/27/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 09/07/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/07/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/15/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/29/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/29/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/29/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/29/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 10/06/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/14/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/14/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/14/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/14/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 10/25/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/16/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 11/16/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 11/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 11/16/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/12/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 12/12/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/12/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/06/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/28/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/07/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/09/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/10/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/10/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/10/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/10/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/24/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 08/02/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 08/02/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 08/02/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/07/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/07/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 08/07/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/07/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/10/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/10/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/20/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/20/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/20/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/20/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/21/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/23/2012