Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/20/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/20/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/08/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/08/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/08/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/08/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/08/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/08/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/08/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/08/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/23/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/23/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/23/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/11/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/11/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 11/18/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/30/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/06/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/18/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/18/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/18/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/24/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/24/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/02/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/06/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/09/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/17/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/20/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/10/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/10/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/31/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/12/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/12/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/02/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/11/2012