Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/25/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/25/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/27/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/21/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/23/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/12/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/15/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/16/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/18/2012