Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 08/05/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 08/05/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 08/09/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/23/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 08/26/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/20/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/06/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/13/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 10/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/31/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 11/03/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 12/06/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/08/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/20/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/01/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/30/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/07/2012