Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/18/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/22/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/26/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/27/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/14/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 12/23/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/23/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 01/27/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/27/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/01/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/06/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/08/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/15/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 02/16/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/17/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/17/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 02/17/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/27/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/05/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/13/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/15/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/01/2012