Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/20/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/26/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/26/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/27/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/28/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/07/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/07/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/13/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/14/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/22/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/22/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/22/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/22/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/23/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/05/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/14/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/14/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/25/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/31/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 10/31/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/17/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/17/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/02/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/20/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/20/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/23/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/01/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/09/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/05/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/18/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/30/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/28/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/30/2012