Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/07/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 07/07/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/11/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 07/13/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/19/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/25/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/12/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/21/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 10/12/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/07/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/08/2012