Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/24/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/24/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/06/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/07/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/22/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/14/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/15/2011