Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/08/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/13/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/03/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/25/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/25/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/30/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/02/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/08/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/08/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/17/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/17/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/17/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/10/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/24/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/01/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/21/2012