Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/15/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/25/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/15/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/06/2011