Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/06/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/06/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/06/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/08/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/08/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/08/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/08/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/25/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/25/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/09/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/09/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/09/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/09/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/09/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/09/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/21/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/21/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/21/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/23/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/23/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/23/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/23/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/23/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/04/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/04/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/04/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/04/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/04/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/12/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/25/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/25/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/26/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/23/2012