Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/23/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/12/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/26/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/25/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 11/15/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 11/16/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/16/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/30/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 12/01/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 01/24/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 02/03/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/16/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 02/16/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/16/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/16/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/28/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/28/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/29/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/29/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/21/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/10/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/13/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/17/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/25/2012