Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 04/26/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/07/2012