Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/21/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/21/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 07/29/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/29/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/29/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/29/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/29/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/29/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/29/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/29/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/29/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/29/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/29/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/15/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/15/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/25/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/25/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/25/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/25/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/25/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/12/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/20/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/20/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/20/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/31/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/31/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/31/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/31/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/31/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/29/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/18/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/18/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/02/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 08/02/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/19/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/19/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/24/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/24/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/24/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/24/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/24/2012