Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/28/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/10/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/03/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/18/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/18/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/17/2012