Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/14/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/15/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/20/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/11/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/11/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/14/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/14/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/27/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/28/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/07/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/14/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/15/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/12/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/24/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/24/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/24/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/02/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/15/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/15/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/02/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 12/06/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/03/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/06/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 04/19/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/18/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/07/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/28/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/12/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/12/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/12/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/19/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/25/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/20/2012