Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/02/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/16/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/16/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/22/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/22/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/12/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/12/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/12/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/12/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/12/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/12/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/12/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/12/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 12/12/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/12/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/12/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/13/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 12/13/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/13/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/13/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/13/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/13/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/13/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/13/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/13/2011