Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/13/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/13/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/14/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/21/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/24/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/05/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/11/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/11/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/11/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/11/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/19/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/19/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/13/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/23/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/11/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/03/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/30/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/15/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/29/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/29/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/29/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/21/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/21/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/21/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/28/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 03/28/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/28/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/28/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/28/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/28/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/28/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/18/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/18/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/18/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/25/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/25/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/25/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/25/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/08/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/08/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/08/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/16/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/16/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/16/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/05/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/18/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 06/29/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/28/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/27/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/27/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/27/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/29/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/11/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/20/2012