Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/16/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/16/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/21/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/08/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/25/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/01/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/05/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/05/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/15/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/18/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/14/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/17/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/02/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/07/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/07/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/09/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/20/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/16/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/25/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/25/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/08/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/01/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/13/2012