Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/02/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/07/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/13/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/28/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/14/2011