Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/05/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/11/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/29/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/13/2011