Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/31/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/01/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/16/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/16/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/16/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/23/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/06/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/11/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/19/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/19/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/22/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/05/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/12/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/20/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/23/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/03/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/19/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/27/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/17/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/29/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/20/2012