Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/02/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/02/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/15/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/15/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/15/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/16/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/16/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/22/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/22/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/22/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/08/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/13/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/13/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/13/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/25/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/25/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/28/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/28/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 08/19/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/19/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 08/19/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 08/19/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/07/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/21/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/21/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/13/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 10/13/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/17/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/21/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/11/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 08/01/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/20/2012