Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/22/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/22/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/22/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/07/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/18/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/30/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/30/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/16/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/17/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/18/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/26/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/23/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/10/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/19/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/21/2012