Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/01/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/15/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/15/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/22/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/07/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/07/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/11/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/15/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/25/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/23/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/01/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/18/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/21/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/18/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/31/2012