Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/14/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/14/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/14/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/22/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/22/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/22/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/22/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/22/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/24/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/24/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/06/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/06/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/06/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/20/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/20/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/20/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/29/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/26/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/26/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 08/26/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/26/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/26/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/26/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/07/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/07/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/12/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/15/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/19/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/19/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/19/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/19/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/19/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/19/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/19/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/19/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/20/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/20/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/20/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/20/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/20/2011