Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/07/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/07/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/07/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/07/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/07/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/07/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/07/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/07/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/07/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/07/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/07/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/07/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/07/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/18/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/19/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/26/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/26/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/08/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/08/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/08/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/08/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/08/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/08/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/08/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/02/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/02/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/03/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/03/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/03/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/06/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/06/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/08/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/14/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/28/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/06/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/28/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/28/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/20/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/12/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/12/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/10/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/20/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/20/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/20/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/20/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 09/20/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/20/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/20/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/20/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/20/2012