Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/25/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/25/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/14/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/13/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/09/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 09/09/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/21/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 10/04/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/25/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/01/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/08/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/15/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/16/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/27/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/28/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/20/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/09/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew