Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/26/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/13/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/13/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/13/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/13/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/13/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/10/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/13/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/01/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 08/01/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/22/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/04/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/04/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/04/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/29/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/14/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/18/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/25/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/08/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/26/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/12/2012