Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/25/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/25/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/25/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/25/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/25/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/02/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/02/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/14/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/14/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/14/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/22/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/24/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/24/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/06/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/08/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/13/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/13/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/20/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/25/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/26/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/26/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/12/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/16/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/16/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 11/18/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/18/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/18/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 12/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/07/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 12/07/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/07/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/13/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/13/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/14/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/19/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/17/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/25/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/25/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 01/25/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/25/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/25/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/31/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/09/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/09/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/01/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/29/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/29/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/16/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/19/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/24/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/27/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/07/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/30/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/30/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/29/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/07/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/12/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/15/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/11/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/11/2012