Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/23/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/13/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/13/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/01/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/01/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/19/2012