Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 05/23/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/23/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/26/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/03/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/21/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/21/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/22/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/22/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/05/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/26/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 08/05/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/02/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/02/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/23/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 10/25/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/17/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/26/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/17/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/17/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/14/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/14/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/21/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/05/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/14/2012