Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/12/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/12/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/12/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/25/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/14/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/14/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/15/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/24/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/24/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/24/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/24/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/06/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/18/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/18/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/18/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/05/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/09/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/09/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 08/19/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/07/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/12/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/22/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/24/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/27/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/03/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/14/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/18/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/25/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/05/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/05/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/19/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/27/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/08/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/08/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/29/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/20/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/16/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/16/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/24/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/24/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/16/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/20/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/20/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/20/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/20/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/10/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/10/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/10/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/10/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/10/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/10/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/10/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/10/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/10/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/10/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/10/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/10/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/12/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/28/2012