Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/01/2011