Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/21/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/11/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/27/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/18/2011