Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/26/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 12/01/2011