Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/21/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/11/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/15/2011