Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/26/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/29/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/01/2011