Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/21/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 12/02/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/05/2011