Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/29/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 09/21/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/05/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/27/2011