Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/02/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 07/26/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/27/2011